EP0733504 - Vehicle air conditioning fluid circuit allowing heating with controllablepower [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO CLIMATISATION 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [1996/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karl, Stefan 85 bd. Pasteur 75015 Paris / FR | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2000/10] |
Former [1996/39] | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400616.7 | 22.03.1996 | [1996/39] | Priority number, date | FR19950003360 | 22.03.1995 Original published format: FR 9503360 | [1996/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733504 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733504 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
B60H1/00314 (EP,US);
B60H1/00007 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B2400/16 (EP,US);
F25B2600/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1996/39] | Title | German: | Fluidkreislauf einer Fahrzeugklimaanlage, der eine Heizung mit steuerbarer Leistung ermöglicht | [1996/39] | English: | Vehicle air conditioning fluid circuit allowing heating with controllablepower | [1996/39] | French: | Circuit de fluide de climatisation pour véhicule permettant un chauffage à puissance réglable | [1996/39] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 03.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Request for further processing for: | 23.06.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.08.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.07.2000 | [2002/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]FR2717126 (VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE [FR]) [PX] 1,6 * abstract *; | [XA]US5291941 (ENOMOTO MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 6; figure 1 * [A] 2,6; | [A]FR2624067 (SUDDEUTSCHE KUHLEFABRIK J BEHR [DE]) |