EP0737984 - Method and apparatus for detecting and monitoring the piercing of a nuclear reactor vessel bottom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grosmaire, Jacques 6 rue des Maronniers 77090 Collegien / FR | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400654.8 | 27.03.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | FR19950004342 | 11.04.1995 Original published format: FR 9504342 | [1996/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737984 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G21C17/003, G21C9/016 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
G21C17/003 (EP,KR,US);
G21C9/016 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, LI, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Detektion und Überwachung des Durchschmelzens eines Kernreaktordruckgefässbodens | [1996/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for detecting and monitoring the piercing of a nuclear reactor vessel bottom | [1996/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection et de surveillance du percement du fond de la cuve d'un réacteur nucléaire | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/18] | 18.02.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE875803 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]BE893431 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]BE897330 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE) [A] 1,9-12 * revendication 1; pages 1-3; figure *; | [DA]EP0213872 (YORK LTD [GB]) [DA] 2-4,6-10 * figures 1,3,4,7; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US4449403 (MCQUEEN MALCOLM M [US]) [A] 1,6 * figure 4; claims 1,5 * |