EP0737435 - Culinary receptacle with a lid provided with a pouring function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois F-69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raoult, Philippe 315 Chemin des Devants, Promery 74370 Pringy / FR | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Keib, Gérard, et al Novagraaf Technologies SA 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [2008/42] |
Former [1996/42] | Keib, Gérard, et al c/o BREVETS RODHAIN & PORTE, 3 rue Moncey 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400751.2 | 05.04.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | FR19950004322 | 11.04.1995 Original published format: FR 9504322 | [1996/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737435 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47J36/08 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
A47J36/08 (EP,US);
Y10S220/912 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, IT, NL [1996/42] | Title | German: | Küchengeschirr mit einem Deckel mit Ausgiessmöglichkeit | [1996/42] | English: | Culinary receptacle with a lid provided with a pouring function | [1996/42] | French: | Récipient culinaire avec couvercle présentant une fonction de versage | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/19] | 25.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/24] | 06.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1998/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9320738 (SILIT WERKE [DE], et al) [DA] 1,4,5,9,10 * page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 8; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE847340 (MAEDRICH HERMANN) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2907467 (MACHATE JR FRED) [A] 1 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 67; figure - *; | [A]DE8814181U (PHILIPS GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN NV) [A] 7 * figure 3 * |