EP0742231 - Process for obtaining superabsorbent polymers for water and aqueous fluids as aggregates of particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2000/34] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux, Hauts-de-Seine / FR | ||
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collette, Christian 2, Rue Vauquelin 75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
Hidalgo, Manuel 2, Rue du Général Henrys 75017 Paris / FR | 03 /
Kowalik, André 3, Allée Henri Becquerel 60270 Gouvieux / FR | 04 /
Puchois, Emmanuel 9, Rue Riquet 75019 Paris / FR | 05 /
Rebre, Shu-Rong 7, Rue Villebois Mareuil 94300 Vincennes / FR | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Haicour, Philippe Godefroy ELF ATOCHEM S.A., Département Propriété Industrielle. 4-8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris Cédex 42 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Haicour, Philippe ELF ATOCHEM S.A., Département Propriété Industrielle. 4-8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris Cédex 42 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400755.3 | 05.04.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | FR19950004325 | 11.04.1995 Original published format: FR 9504325 | [1996/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742231 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742231 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/32, C08F265/02, C08J3/12, // C08L33:02 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
C08J3/12 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,US);
C08F265/02 (EP,US);
C08J3/16 (EP,US);
C08J2300/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/60, C08L33/02 (US,EP);
C08F265/02, C08F220/06 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Wasser oder wässrige Flüssigkeiten absorbierende Polymeren in Form von aggregierten Partikeln | [1996/46] | English: | Process for obtaining superabsorbent polymers for water and aqueous fluids as aggregates of particles | [1996/46] | French: | Procédé pour l'obtention de polymères superabsorbants pour l'eau et les fluides aqueux sous forme d'agrégats de particules | [1999/43] |
Former [1996/46] | Procédé pour l'obtention de polymères superabsorbants pour l'eau et les fluides aqueux sous forme d'agregats de particules | Examination procedure | 18.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 23.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2000 | FI | 28.06.2000 | DK | 28.09.2000 | PT | 28.09.2000 | SE | 28.09.2000 | GR | 29.09.2000 | IE | 09.03.2001 | [2004/51] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
FI | 28.06.2000 | ||
DK | 28.09.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
IE | 09.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
FI | 28.06.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
IE | 09.03.2001 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
FI | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
FI | 28.06.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 28.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0036463 (SEITETSU KAGAKU CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-9 *; | [D]JPS6025045B ; | [DA]WO9008789 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [DA] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [DA]EP0441507 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS [JP]) [DA] 1 * claims 1-16 *; | [DA]EP0522570 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * claims 1-7 * |