EP0744511 - Prestressed concrete beam and process for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RECTOR S.A. 16, rue de Hirtzbach 68200 Mulhouse / FR | [1996/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Savard Chambard, Paul Eden Park, Chemin des Lavandins 06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401126.6 | 24.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | FR19950006183 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: FR 9506183 | [1996/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744511 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744511 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E04C5/065, E04C3/26, B28B7/34 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
B28B7/34 (EP);
E04C3/26 (EP);
E04C5/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, NL, PT [1996/48] | Title | German: | Spannbetonträger, sowie Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1996/48] | English: | Prestressed concrete beam and process for making the same | [1996/48] | French: | Poutrelle en béton précontraint et son procédé de fabrication | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 07.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.02.2003 | PT | 12.05.2003 | DE | 13.05.2003 | ES | 28.08.2003 | [2004/05] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
ES | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 12.02.2003 | |
PT | 12.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | PT | 12.05.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191221383 (EMPERGER FRITZ EDLEN VON [AT]) [A] 1,5-9 * & GB-A-21383 A.D. 1912; page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US1465307 (KEOGAN RICHARD C) [A] 1 * column 1, line 9 - line 35; figure - *; | [A]FR896405 (WAYSS & FREYTAG A G) [A] 1 * figures 2,5 *; | [A]US2435998 (PAUL CUENI CLEMENT) [A] 1 * column 9, line 30 - line 37; figure - *; | [A]FR988851 (SAINRAPT & BRICE ETS) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, paragraph L - page 3, column 1, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]FR1098393 (ROSSMANN) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [Y]FR1270049 (JANCOVICI ET AL.) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR1589789 (ROQUE ET AL.) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2403431 (COSTAMAGNA & CIE B M [FR]) [A] 1,5-9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2436660 (COSTAMAGNA & CIE B M) [A] 1,5-9 * page 5, paragraph 1 ** page 6, line 28 - page 8, line 5; figure - * |