EP0747559 - Winch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rothgangl, Erhard 19 ter Avenue des Pavillons 93600 Aulnay Sous Bois / FR | [2002/20] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states Rothgangl, Ehrhard 19 ter Avenue des Pavillons 93600 Aulnay Sous Bois / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401174.6 | 31.05.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | PL19950102799 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: PL 10279995 | PL19950103824 | 30.11.1995 Original published format: PL 10382495 | [1996/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0747559 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0747559 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/20, A62C2/24 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
A62C2/247 (EP);
E05F15/72 (EP);
E05F1/02 (EP);
E05Y2201/214 (EP);
E05Y2201/22 (EP);
E05Y2201/244 (EP);
E05Y2201/246 (EP);
E05Y2201/422 (EP);
E05Y2201/462 (EP);
E05Y2201/50 (EP);
E05Y2201/654 (EP);
E05Y2201/664 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1996/50] | Extension states | SI | 10.06.1996 | Title | German: | Winde | [1996/50] | English: | Winch | [1996/50] | French: | Treuil | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.05.2002 | GB | 15.05.2002 | IT | 15.05.2002 | NL | 15.05.2002 | BE | 31.05.2002 | CH | 31.05.2002 | LI | 31.05.2002 | LU | 31.05.2002 | GR | 16.08.2002 | PT | 16.08.2002 | DE | 17.08.2002 | ES | 28.11.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 15.05.2002 | |
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
NL | 15.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
LU | 31.05.2002 | ||
GR | 16.08.2002 | ||
PT | 16.08.2002 | ||
DE | 17.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 15.05.2002 | |
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
NL | 15.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
LU | 31.05.2002 | ||
PT | 16.08.2002 | ||
DE | 17.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 15.05.2002 | |
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
NL | 15.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
PT | 16.08.2002 | ||
DE | 17.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 15.05.2002 | |
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
NL | 15.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
PT | 16.08.2002 | ||
DE | 17.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 15.05.2002 | |
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
NL | 15.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
PT | 16.08.2002 | ||
DE | 17.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 15.05.2002 | |
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
NL | 15.05.2002 | ||
PT | 16.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 15.05.2002 | |
GB | 15.05.2002 | ||
NL | 15.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 15.05.2002 | |
NL | 15.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 15.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2605620 (DUPUY CLAUDE [FR]) [DA] 1* abstract * |