EP0753697 - Quick acting coupling device between a pipeline and a joint, especially for a heat exchanger, and heat exchanger comprising this device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO CLIMATISATION 8, rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states VALEO CLIMATISATION 8 Rue Louis-Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martins, Carlos 10 rue de la Moutière 78490 Montfort / FR | 02 /
Wurmser, Martin 29,rue Isabey 54000 Nancy / FR | [1997/04] |
Former [1997/03] | 01 /
Martins, Carlos 10 rue de la Moutière 78490 Montfort / FR | ||
02 /
Wurmser, Martin 17 rue Navarin 72000 Le Mans / FR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2000/03] |
Former [1997/03] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401406.2 | 25.06.1996 | [1997/03] | Priority number, date | FR19950007784 | 28.06.1995 Original published format: FR 9507784 | [1997/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0753697 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/088, F16L37/56 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
F16L37/0885 (EP,US);
F16L37/56 (EP,US);
F28F9/0246 (EP,US);
F28F9/0258 (EP,US);
Y10S285/914 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1997/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Schnellverbindung einer Rohrleitung mit einem Anschlussstück, insbesondere für einen Wärmetauscher, sowie ein mit dieser Vorrichtung bestückter Wärmetauscher | [1997/03] | English: | Quick acting coupling device between a pipeline and a joint, especially for a heat exchanger, and heat exchanger comprising this device | [1997/03] | French: | Dispositif de raccord rapide entre une tubulure et un embout, notamment pour échangeur de chaleur, et échangeur de chaleur équipé d'un tel dispositif | [1997/03] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 19.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/30] | 03.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0593937 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3,4,8-11,13,15,16 * column 6, line 34 - column 7, line 21 * * column 8, line 39 - column 9, line 47 * * column 11, line 56 - column 12, line 58 * * column 13, line 27 - column 14, line 18 * * claims 1,5,8,11 * * figures 1,3,5,6,9,20,26,53,60,65,67 (voir aussi col. 3, ligne 50 - col. 6, ligne 27) *; | [A]DE4037308 (RASMUSSEN GMBH) [A] 1,3,4,14-16 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 47 * * claim 13 * * figures 1,5 *; | [DA]FR2713305 (VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE [FR]) [DA] 1,9,12-16 * abstract * * page 3, line 34 - page 5, line 30 * * figure 2 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2521127 (PRICE HARRY N) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 * * figure 3 * |