EP0758546 - Cosmetic composition containing an aqueous dispersion of a nonionic polymer, utilisation and preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/08] | Cosmetic composition containing an aqueous dispersion of a nonionic polymer, utilization and preparation | ||
[2003/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Samain, Henri 14, rue du Coteau 91570 Bievres / FR | 02 /
Bauer, Daniel 8 bis, allée de la Fontaine 93340 Le Raincy / FR | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Andral, Christophe André Louis L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | Andral, Christophe André Louis L'OREAL Centre de Recherche Charles Zviak Département Propriété Industrielle 90, rue du Général Roguet 92583 Clichy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401643.0 | 23.07.1996 | [1997/08] | Priority number, date | FR19950009772 | 11.08.1995 Original published format: FR 9509772 | [1997/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758546 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758546 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/08] | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung die eine wässrige nicht-ionische Polymerdispersion enthält, ihre Verwendung und Herstellungsverfahren | [2003/22] | English: | Cosmetic composition containing an aqueous dispersion of a nonionic polymer, utilisation and preparation | [2003/22] | French: | Composition cosmétique comprenant une dispersion aqueuse de polymère non ionique, utilisation et procédé de fabrication | [2003/22] |
Former [1997/08] | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung die eine wässrige nicht-ionische Polymerdispersion enthält, seine Verwendung und Herstellung | ||
Former [1997/08] | Cosmetic composition containing an aqueous dispersion of a nonionic polymer, utilization and preparation | ||
Former [1997/08] | Composition cosmétique comprenant une dispersion aqueuse de polymère non ionique, utilisation et procédé | Examination procedure | 19.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Request for further processing for: | 05.12.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.10.2003 | ES | 09.02.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/46] | ES | 09.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0288012 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [A]EP0320218 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [A]EP0323715 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [A]FR2697160 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [PX]WO9528909 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [PX] 1-12* the whole document * |