EP0763803 - Anonymous information counting system for statistics, particularly for electronic voting operations or periodical consumption inventory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/12] | Anonymous information acounting system for statistics, particularly for electronic voting operations or periodical consumption inventory | ||
[1999/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [1999/50] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 9, place des Vosges La Défense 5 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Jean-Bernard Thomson multimedia 92050 Paris la defense Cedex / FR | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1997/12] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON Multimedia, 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 5 92050 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401956.6 | 13.09.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | FR19950010841 | 15.09.1995 Original published format: FR 9510841 | [1997/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763803 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763803 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G07C13/00, G06F17/60 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
G07C13/00 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/383 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/12] | Title | German: | Anonymes Informationsverwaltungssystem für Statistiken, insbesondere für elektronische Wahlverfahren oder periodische Verbrauchsstücklisten | [1997/12] | English: | Anonymous information counting system for statistics, particularly for electronic voting operations or periodical consumption inventory | [1999/03] | French: | Système de comptabilisation anonyme d'informations à des fins statistiques, notamment pour des opérations de vote électronique ou de relevés périodiques de consommation | [1997/12] |
Former [1997/12] | Anonymous information acounting system for statistics, particularly for electronic voting operations or periodical consumption inventory | Examination procedure | 04.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 18.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9203805 (TECNOMEN OY [FI]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 6, line 18 - page 14, line 29; figure - * [Y] 3-5,9; | [A]US5218528 (WISE GEORGE E [US], et al) | [Y] - SLESSENGER, "socially secure cryptographic election scheme", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, STEVENAGE GB, (19910523), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 955 - 957, XP000232446 [Y] 3-5,9 * page 956, column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 69 * | [A] - NURMI, "secret ballot elections in computer networks", COMPUTERS & SECURITY INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL DEVOTED TO THE STUDY OF TECHNICAL AND FINANCIAL ASPECTS OF COMPUTER SECURITY., AMSTERDAM NL, (1991), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 553 - 559, XP000264766 [A] 1 * page 555, column 2, line 4 - page 557, column 1, line 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4048(91)90081-N | [A] - AKIYAMA, "secret ballot systems using cryptography", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, SILVER SPRING, MARYLAND, USA, (1985), vol. 68, no. 12, pages 7 - 16, XP000570808 |