EP0767018 - Punching machine with material removal device for punched plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amada America Inc. 7025 Firestone Boulevard Buena Park California 90621 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/15] | For all designated states Amada America Inc. 7025 Firestone Boulevard Buena Park, California 90621 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanazawa, Masato 7025 Firestone Boulevard Buena Park, California 90621 / US | [1997/15] | Representative(s) | Hasenrader, Hubert Karl, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/15] | Hasenrader, Hubert, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96402118.2 | 04.10.1996 | [1997/15] | Priority number, date | US19950538653 | 04.10.1995 Original published format: US 538653 | [1997/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0767018 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0767018 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B21D43/18, B21D43/00 | [1997/15] | CPC: |
B65G57/04 (EP,US);
B21D43/18 (EP,US);
B21D43/20 (EP,US);
B65G47/918 (EP,US);
B65G57/035 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0453 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0476 (EP,US);
Y10T83/0524 (EP,US);
Y10T83/145 (EP,US);
Y10T83/162 (EP,US);
Y10T83/18 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2037 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2057 (EP,US);
Y10T83/207 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2185 (EP,US);
Y10T83/222 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/15] | Title | German: | Stanzmaschine mit Transportvorrichtung für gestanzten Blech | [1997/15] | English: | Punching machine with material removal device for punched plate | [1997/15] | French: | Machine à poinçonner avec dispositif de transport des tôles poinçonnées | [1997/15] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5120178 (ITO MASAOKI [JP]) [A] 1,12 * column 11, line 23 - column 12, line 46; figures 4-8 *; | [A]EP0106056 (TRUMPF GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,12 * figures 1,2; claims 1-11 *; | [A]DE3504586 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,12 * page 6, lines 24-31; figure 1 * * page 7, lines 13-30 * |