EP0777251 - Interface adaptor to insert between a differential switch and an electrical auxiliary [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEGRAND 128 Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | For all designated states Legrand SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre-de-Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/23] | For all designated states LEGRAND 128 Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states LEGRAND SNC 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87000 Limoges / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evrard, Jean-Luc 69 Route de Pégomas Hameau des Myrtes, 06130 Grasse / FR | 02 /
Cottone, Guy 1085 Chemin du Puits du Plan 06370 Mouans Sartoux / FR | [1997/23] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [1997/23] | Application number, filing date | 96402575.3 | 28.11.1996 | [1997/23] | Priority number, date | FR19950014207 | 01.12.1995 Original published format: FR 9514207 | [1997/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777251 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777251 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/10 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
H01H71/1009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [1997/23] | Title | German: | Schnittstelle zur Anpassung zwischen Differentialschalter und elektrisches Hilfmittel | [1997/23] | English: | Interface adaptor to insert between a differential switch and an electrical auxiliary | [1997/23] | French: | Interface d'adaptation à insérer entre un interrupteur différentiel et un auxiliaire électrique | [1997/23] | Examination procedure | 30.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 07.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0650178 (LEGRAND SA [FR], et al) [DA] 1* abstract * | by applicant | EP0650178 |