EP0779293 - 1,2-Dioxetane derivatives as chemiluscent agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states FUJIREBIO Inc. 7-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-07 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Masakatsu 4-8-509, Araisono Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Nobuko 937-130, Tokiwa Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Hisako 4-13-2-305, Higashifuchinobe Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Ikawa, Hiroshi 1-26-10, Miyasaka, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96402622.3 | 04.12.1996 | [1997/25] | Priority number, date | JP19950337717 | 04.12.1995 Original published format: JP 33771795 | [1997/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0779293 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0779293 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D493/04, G01N33/533 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
C07D493/04 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C07F9/6561 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/25] | Title | German: | 1,2-Dioxetan-Derivate als Wirkstoffe der Chemolumineszenz | [2000/46] | English: | 1,2-Dioxetane derivatives as chemiluscent agents | [1997/25] | French: | Dérivés de 1,2-dioxétane comme agents de chimioluminescence | [1997/25] |
Former [1997/25] | 1,2-Dioxetan-Derivate als Wirkstoffe der Chemolumineszensz | Examination procedure | 16.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/07] | 16.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.10.2001 | BE | 24.10.2001 | CH | 24.10.2001 | FI | 24.10.2001 | LI | 24.10.2001 | IE | 04.12.2001 | LU | 04.12.2001 | MC | 04.12.2001 | DK | 24.01.2002 | PT | 24.01.2002 | SE | 24.01.2002 | GR | 25.01.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2017/08] |
Former [2004/51] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
IE | 04.12.2001 | ||
LU | 04.12.2001 | ||
MC | 04.12.2001 | ||
DK | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
GR | 25.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/42] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
IE | 04.12.2001 | ||
LU | 04.12.2001 | ||
MC | 04.12.2001 | ||
DK | 24.01.2002 | ||
GB | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LU | 04.12.2001 | ||
MC | 04.12.2001 | ||
DK | 24.01.2002 | ||
GB | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
MC | 04.12.2001 | ||
DK | 24.01.2002 | ||
GB | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
ES | 30.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
MC | 04.12.2001 | ||
DK | 24.01.2002 | ||
GB | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 24.10.2001 | |
BE | 24.10.2001 | ||
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
MC | 04.12.2001 | ||
GB | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 24.10.2001 | |
CH | 24.10.2001 | ||
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
MC | 04.12.2001 | ||
GB | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 24.10.2001 | |
FI | 24.10.2001 | ||
LI | 24.10.2001 | ||
MC | 04.12.2001 | ||
GB | 24.01.2002 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 24.10.2001 | |
MC | 04.12.2001 | ||
PT | 24.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/43] | FI | 24.10.2001 | |
MC | 04.12.2001 | ||
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 24.10.2001 | |
SE | 24.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 24.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0254051 (UNIV WAYNE STATE [US]) [A] 1-16* example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9103479 (TROPIX INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0518387 (UNIV WAYNE STATE [US]) [Y] 1-16 * page 1 - page 6; example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO9410258 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [Y] 1-16 * example 5; claims 1,2 * |