EP0783843 - Helmet with night-vision device and optimized safety and ergonomics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES AVIONICS S.A. Aérodrome de Villacoublay, Boîte Postale 200 Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78141 Vélizy Villacoublay Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states THALES AVIONICS S.A. Aérodrome de Villacoublay, Boîte Postale 200 Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78141 Vélizy Villacoublay Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF SEXTANT Aérodrome de Villacoublay, Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78141 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | ||
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states SEXTANT AVIONIQUE Aérodrome de Villacoublay 78141 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cursolle, Jean-Pierre, Thomson-CSF SCPI, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 02 /
François, Jean-Michel, Thomson-CSF SCPI, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 03 /
Gerbe, Jean-Pierre, Thomson-CSF SCPI, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 04 /
Lacroux, Patrick, Thomson-CSF SCPI, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 05 /
Plantier, Denis, Thomson-CSF SCPI, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [1997/29] | Representative(s) | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al THOMSON-CSF-S.C.P.I., 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96402733.8 | 13.12.1996 | [1997/29] | Priority number, date | FR19950015487 | 26.12.1995 Original published format: FR 9515487 | [1997/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783843 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783843 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/22, A42B3/04, G02B27/01 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
A42B3/221 (EP,US);
A42B3/042 (EP,US);
G02B23/125 (EP,US);
G02B27/0176 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/29] | Title | German: | Helm mit Nachtsichtvorrichtung und optimierter Sicherheit und Ergonomie | [1997/29] | English: | Helmet with night-vision device and optimized safety and ergonomics | [1997/29] | French: | Casque à dispositif de vision nocturne à sécurité et ergonomie optimisées | [1997/29] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.11.2001 | BE | 31.12.2001 | ES | 30.05.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/04] | BE | 31.12.2001 | |
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 31.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB974901 (PREC MACHINING ENGINEERS HARRO); | [A]FR2070298 (OPTIQUE SCIENT); | [A]FR2289072 (JOUANNO RENE JEAN [FR]); | [A]FR2340020 (LUC BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1,9-15 * page 2, lignes 8 - 11, 19 -27 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2391664 (PH DIFFUSION [FR]); | [A]US4170042 (AILEO JACKSON A [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * column W *; | [A]GB2022989 (NOLAN SPA) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0384880 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column A * * page 3, line 1 - line 5 * * page 3, line 55 - page 5, line 7 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0395570 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 31 - line 43 * * page 4, lignes 2 - 4, 52 - 57 * * page 5, lignes 10 - 16, 50 - 56 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0481860 (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE [FR]); | [A]US5254852 (FILIPOVICH DANNY [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]EP0657111 (SEXTANT AVIONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1 * column A; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9528100 (MALENOTTI FRANCO [IT]) [A] 1,2,5 * page 8, line 9 - page 10, line 2 * * figures 1-6B * |