EP0780948 - Device for radial expansion of an elastomeric sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagem SA 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states SAGEM SA 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states SAT (Société Anonyme de Télécommunications) 6, avenue d'Iéna 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tissier, Guy 1 rue Atanase Housset 77130 St-Germain Laval / FR | 02 /
Berthellemy, Jean-Pierre 14 avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 77130 Montereau / FR | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, Rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1997/26] | Fruchard, Guy, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 23, rue la Boetie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96402767.6 | 17.12.1996 | [1997/26] | Priority number, date | FR19950015046 | 19.12.1995 Original published format: FR 9515046 | [1997/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0780948 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0780948 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/18, H02G1/14, B29C63/18 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
H02G15/1826 (EP);
B29C55/24 (EP);
B29C63/18 (EP);
H02G1/14 (EP);
B29K2021/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, LU, PT [1997/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum radialen Aufweiten einer Elastomermuffe | [1997/26] | English: | Device for radial expansion of an elastomeric sleeve | [1997/26] | French: | Dispositif d'expansion radiale d'un manchon élastomère | [1997/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 29.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 17.12.1999 | [2007/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1128074 (STEWARTS & LLOYDS LTD) [AD] 1 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2503476 (FABRICATION CABLES ELECT CIE G [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]US4506430 (GUZAY JR CASIMIR M [US]) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | GB1128074 |