EP0735582 - Package for mounting an IC-chip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | [1999/05] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni F-94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petit, Luc 62, Rue des Alpes 38600 Fontaine / FR | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [1996/40] | Application number, filing date | 96410031.7 | 26.03.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | FR19950004065 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: FR 9504065 | [1996/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735582 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0735582 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
H01L23/49531 (EP,US);
H01L23/49541 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00015 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/40] | Title | German: | Packung zur Montage eines IC-Chips | [1996/40] | English: | Package for mounting an IC-chip | [1996/40] | French: | Boîtier de montage d'une puce de circuit intégré | [1996/40] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06252330 ; | [A]JPH0547986 ; | [A]JPS5882540 ; | [A]EP0503072 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0534678 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5256598 (FARNWORTH WARREN M [US], et al) [DA] 1,3 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941207), vol. 018, no. 643, Database accession no. (E - 1640), & JP06252330 A 19940909 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930629), vol. 017, no. 344, Database accession no. (E - 1390), & JP05047986 A 19930226 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830806), vol. 007, no. 178, Database accession no. (E - 191), & JP58082540 A 19830518 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 4,5 * abstract * |