EP0729759 - Packaging for sterilisation and preservation of organic matter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCK BIOMATERIAL FRANCE Les Hortensias 01800 Charnoz / FR | For all designated states Chiron, Philippe Charles 22, Route de Saint Simon 31100 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states MERCK BIOMATERIAL FRANCE Les Hortensias F-01800 Charnoz / FR | ||
For all designated states Chiron, Philippe Charles 22, Route de Saint Simon 31100 Toulouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiron, Philippe Charles 22, Route de Saint Simon 31100 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
Collomb, Jean L'Ollagnier 26800 Portes Les Valence / FR | 03 /
Picault, Charles 19, Chemin de la Fournache 69110 Sainte-Foy-Les-Lyon / FR | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | [1996/36] | Application number, filing date | 96420066.1 | 29.02.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | FR19950002655 | 01.03.1995 Original published format: FR 9502655 | [1996/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729759 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/26, A01N1/02 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
A61L2/0023 (EP);
A61B50/30 (EP);
A61L2/06 (EP);
A61L2/26 (EP);
A61B2050/005 (EP);
A61B2090/0813 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1996/36] | Title | German: | Verpackung für Sterilisation und Konservierung von organischem Material | [1996/36] | English: | Packaging for sterilisation and preservation of organic matter | [1996/36] | French: | Conditionnement de stérilisation et de conservation de matières organiques | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0584484 (TULASZEWSKI O.); | [A]WO8705520 (RILEY MEDICAL); | [A]EP0152544 (GEORG WAGNER KG) |