EP0759565 - Method of making a color filter array by colorant transfer and lamination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Long, Michael Edgar, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Boroson, Michael Louis, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Buff, Michel KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Buff, Michel Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96420272.5 | 16.08.1996 | [1997/09] | Priority number, date | US19950002658 | 22.08.1995 Original published format: US 2658 | US19960644760 | 10.05.1996 Original published format: US 644760 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759565 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/20, G02F1/1335, G03C7/12 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
B41M5/38207 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Farbfilteranordnung durch Farbstoffübertragung und Laminierung | [1997/09] | English: | Method of making a color filter array by colorant transfer and lamination | [1997/09] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de filtre-réseau coloré par transfert de colorants et laminage | [1997/09] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 01.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/33] | 24.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4560241 (STOLOV MICHAEL [IL], et al) [X] 1 * column W *; | [X]US4690511 (WATANABE HARUO [JP]) [X] 1 * column W *; | [X]JPS6368812 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]JPS60249121 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0432608 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [DA] 1,3-8 * column W *; | [A]EP0410387 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column W * |