EP0825526 - Method for supporting interaction between two units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/08] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carré, Laurent 26, rue Van Gogh 78960 Voisins-le-Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
Hauw, Linda Hélène 59, boulevard Arago 75013 Paris / FR | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Kugler, Hermann, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Kugler, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys., et al Alcatel Alsthom Intellectual Property Department, Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96440064.2 | 20.08.1996 | [1998/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825526 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825526 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
G06F9/465 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/09] | G06F9/00, G06F9/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/45] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Unterstützung der Interaktion zwischen einer ersten und einer zweiten Einheit | [1998/09] | English: | Method for supporting interaction between two units | [1998/09] | French: | Procédé pour l'interaction entre deux unités | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 26.08.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - "DISTRIBUTED OBJECT ENCAPSULATION OF CUSTOMER INFORMATION CONTROL SYST)7:2STR2B1T): TRA(SACT23( PR3C)SS2(G", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19950101), vol. 38, no. 1, pages 177 - 180, XP000498730 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - "USE OF XA-COMPLIANT TO INTEROPERATE WITH OBJECT TRANSACTION SERVICE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19950301), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 617 - 619, XP000508157 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |