EP0730131 - Cooling apparatus for a fluid or for condensation of steam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA-ERGE-SPIRALE ET SORAMAT (S.A.) 2, rue de l'Electrolyse F-62410 Wingles / FR | [1996/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lemaire, Didier 2,rue E. Moreau F-62138 Billy Bercleau / FR | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre (Euralille) 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 37, rue du Vieux Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | ||
Former [1997/03] | Matkowska, Franck, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 37, rue du Vieux Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | ||
Former [1996/36] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 37, rue du Vieux Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 96490012.0 | 23.02.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | EP19950490007 | 24.02.1995 Original published format: EP 95490007 | [1996/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730131 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F28D5/02 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
F28D5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Kühlen einer Flüssigkeit oder Kondensieren von Dampf | [1996/36] | English: | Cooling apparatus for a fluid or for condensation of steam | [1996/36] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement d'un fluide ou de condensation d'une vapeur | [1996/36] | File destroyed: | 22.04.2003 | Examination procedure | 05.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/46] | 19.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]FR2096556 (BALTIMORE AIRCOIL) [XD] 1,2 * pages 6-9; figures 6-8 *; | [A]US2278242 (R.L. CHAPMAN) [A] 1,7,8 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR1509810 (E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS) [A] 1,9 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE2250794 (TYEPLOELEKTROPROJEKT) [A] 7,8 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO9015299 (W. MULLER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH05997488 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840926), vol. 8, no. 210, Database accession no. (M - 328)<1647> , & JP5997488 A 19840605 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) [A] 1 * abstract * |