EP0757091 - Procedure used to generate electric energy from used oils and other petroleum residues [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SENER, INGENIERIA Y SISTEMAS, S.A. Avda. de Zugazarte, 56, Las Arenas E-48930 Guecho (Vizcaya) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states SENER, INGENIERIA Y SISTEMAS, S.A. Avda. de Zugazarte, 56, Las Arenas E-48930 Guecho (Vizcaya) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Angulo Aramburu, Jeronimo Jose Teresa No.1 Pozuelo de Alarcon, Madrid / ES | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Davila Baz, Angel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Davila Baz, Angel, et al c/o Clarke, Modet & Co., Avda. de los Encuartes 21 28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES | ||
Former [1997/06] | Hernandez Covarrubias, Arturo c/o Clarke, Modet & Co., Avda. de los Encuartes 21 28760 Tres Cantos (Madrid) / ES | Application number, filing date | 96500112.6 | 31.07.1996 | [1997/06] | Priority number, date | ES19950001569 | 02.08.1995 Original published format: ES 9501569 | [1997/06] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0757091 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757091 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/00, C10G21/00 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
C10L1/00 (EP);
C10G21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von elektrischer Energie aus Altölen und anderen Petroleumresiduen | [1997/06] | English: | Procedure used to generate electric energy from used oils and other petroleum residues | [1997/06] | French: | Méthode de production d'énergie à partir d'huiles usées et d'autres résidus de pétrole | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 28.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6270487 ; | [PA]WO9521902 (INTERLINE RESOURCES CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1-4,6,9 * claims 1-3,6,19,20 * * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 3 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 18, Database accession no. 87-127159, XP002018423 & JPS6270487 A 19870331 (NIPPON MINING KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |