EP0737738 - Bleach tablets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLEANTABS A/S Englandsvej 12 DK-8450 Hammel / DK | [1996/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Erik 19, 1.t.v., Norregade 8450 Hammel / DK | 02 /
Kristensen, Anders Bjerre 9, Guldblommevej 8600 Silkeborg / DK | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik, et al Chas. Hude 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik, et al Chas. Hude, 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [1996/42] | Stephensen, Birgitte Borregaard, et al c/o Chas. Hude, 33, H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 96610014.1 | 11.04.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | DK19950000446 | 12.04.1995 Original published format: DK 44695 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0737738 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0737738 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737738 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39, C11D3/08, C11D3/12, C11D3/20, C11D17/00 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
C11D17/0039 (EP);
C11D17/0073 (EP);
C11D3/08 (EP);
C11D3/1273 (EP);
C11D3/2086 (EP);
C11D3/3917 (EP);
C11D3/3942 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/42] | Title | German: | Bleichmitteltabletten | [1996/42] | English: | Bleach tablets | [1996/42] | French: | Comprimés d'agent de blanchiment | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0481793 (UNILEVER) [X] 1-4,6,9,10 * page 5, lines 3-6 * * page 5, lines 34-35 * * page 5, lines 15-24 * * page 5, line 57 - page 6, line 3 * * page 6, lines 11-12; claims 1,7 *; | [A]EP0550077 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1,3,4,6,9,10 * page 3, line 33 - page 5 *; | [PA]DE4424005 (HENKEL) [PA] 1 * page 3, lines 22-24 * * page 4, lines 4-15; claims 1,2,4,6 * | other | EP0550077 |