EP0763660 - Variable capacity vane compressor with linear actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZEXEL USA CORPORATION 707 Southside Drive Decatur Illinois 62521 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states ZEXEL USA CORPORATION 707 Southside Drive Decatur, Illinois 62521 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bearint, David E. 4722 Dogwood Court Decatur, Illinois 62526 / US | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 96630045.1 | 08.08.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | US19950529875 | 18.09.1995 Original published format: US 529875 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0763660 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0763660 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763660 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/10, F04C18/344 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
F04C28/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/12] | F04C18/344, F04C29/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | Flügelzellenverdichter mit veränderlicher Durchflussmenge | [1997/12] | English: | Variable capacity vane compressor with linear actuator | [1997/12] | French: | Compresseur à palettes à capacité variable | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 10.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.07.2001 | SE | 04.10.2001 | ES | 31.01.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/04] | SE | 04.10.2001 | |
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/15] | SE | 04.10.2001 | |
DE | 05.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 04.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3824213 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 6 * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 49; figures 1,5 * * column 9, line 19 - line 25; figure 9 * [A] 1,3; | [A]US5035584 (AKAIKE SEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,13 * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, line 14 - line 34 * * column 5 - column 6; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]US5364235 (BEARINT DAVID E [US]) [DA] 1* column W * |