EP0744321 - Modular rearview mirror assembly and method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONNELLY CORPORATION 414 East Fortieth Street Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states DONNELLY CORPORATION 414 East Fortieth Street Holland Michigan 49423 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veldman, Roger L. 608 West 29th Street Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | 02 /
Bos, Brent J. 458 West Main Avenue Zeeland, Michigan 49464 / US | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 96650015.9 | 15.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | US19950448883 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: US 448883 | [1996/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0744321 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0744321 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744321 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/12 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
B60R1/1207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1996/48] | Title | German: | Modulare Rückspiegel und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1996/48] | English: | Modular rearview mirror assembly and method for making same | [1996/48] | French: | Rétroviseur modulaire et son procédé de fabrication | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 26.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 21.02.2002 | [2002/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4807096 (SKOGLER BRIAN I [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column A *; | [A]US4646210 (SKOGLER BRIAN I [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column A *; | [PA]JPH07277072 ; | [PA]DE4415885 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]); | [A]WO9412368 (MUTH K W CO INC [US]) | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 096, no. 002, & JP07277072 A 19951024 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [PA] 10-19 * abstract * |