EP0761571 - Method and apparatus for depositing products continuously fed by a delivering conveyor onto a platform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LT-Kone Oy Kutojantie 4 02630 Espoo / FI | [1997/21] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states HYDROVOIMA OY Kuormakatu 2 SF-20380 Turku 38 / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lammela, Martti Toininkuja 9 21380 Aura / FI | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Eriksson, Svante Johan Christer, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Eriksson, Svante Johan Christer, et al Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 96660055.3 | 09.09.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | FI19950004254 | 11.09.1995 Original published format: FI 954254 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0761571 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0761571 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761571 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A21C9/08, B65G37/00, B65G47/34 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
B65G21/14 (EP);
A21C9/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/11] | B65G37/00, B65G47/34 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Ablegen von kontinuierlich von einem Übergabeförderer zugeführten Produkten auf eine Plattform | [1997/11] | English: | Method and apparatus for depositing products continuously fed by a delivering conveyor onto a platform | [1997/11] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour produits alimentés en continu par un convoyeur de transfert sur une plateforme | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 12.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3310250 (EDMUND SCHRÖDER MASCHINENFABRIK) [A] 1,3,7,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2647766 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [A] 1,7,8,11 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]AT272234B (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2457046 (FR. WINKLER) [A] 1,7 * figure 1; claim 1 * |