EP0726382 - Rotary drilling tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft FL-9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumann, Ralf Mattenhof B CH-9473 Gams / CH | 02 /
Petry, Martin Lindenweg 1 CH-9472 Grabs / CH | 03 /
Schweizer, Edwin Gribstrasse 13 CH-9475 Sevelen / CH | 04 /
Stöck, Maximilian Gelalunga CH-9478 Azmoos / CH | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | [2009/38] |
Former [1996/33] | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9490 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 96810018.0 | 09.01.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | DE19951004466 | 10.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19504466 | [1996/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0726382 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0726382 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/44, E21B10/36 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
E21B10/445 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, SE [1996/33] | Title | German: | Drehbohrwerkzeug | [1996/33] | English: | Rotary drilling tool | [1996/33] | French: | Outil de forage rotatif | [1996/33] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/06] | 04.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0470354 (FISCHERWERKE A. FISCHER) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 9 * * figure -; claims 1-3,7,9 *; | [A]DE2013328 (WERKZEUGBAU) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * |