EP0731315 - Nozzle shut-off valve and pressure spray nozzle with such a shut-off valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SATRONIC AG Honeywell-Platz 1 8157 Dielsdorf / CH | [2000/03] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states SATRONIC AG Brüelstrasse 7 CH-8157 Dielsdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caminada, Marcel Gässlistrasse 24 8172 Niederglatt / CH | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 8035 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 96810122.0 | 05.03.1996 | [1996/37] | Priority number, date | CH19950000636 | 06.03.1995 Original published format: CH 63695 | [1996/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0731315 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0731315 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F23D11/38, F23D11/26, B05B1/30 | [1996/37] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/37] | Title | German: | Düsenabschlussventil sowie Druckzerstäuberdüse mit einem solchen Düsenabschlussventil | [1996/37] | English: | Nozzle shut-off valve and pressure spray nozzle with such a shut-off valve | [1996/37] | French: | Soupape de fermeture pour une buse et buse de pulvérisation sous pression avec une telle soupape de fermeture | [1996/37] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 07.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.11.1999 | NL | 03.11.1999 | PT | 03.02.2000 | [2003/09] |
Former [2001/09] | GB | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 03.02.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1577740 (ATELIERS DES CHARMILLES S.A.) [X] 1 * page 1, line 42 - page 2, line 29; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]FR2184247 (BERTHOUD SA [FR]) [Y] 4-6 * page 4, line 7 - page 4, line 14; figure 2 *; | [A]DE3320270 (GROENER HUBERT) [A] 10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0230150 (SPRAYING SYSTEMS CO [US]) [A] 1,4 * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3901032 (DANFOSS A/S) [A] 7 * column 5, line 53 - column 5, line 62; figure 5 *; | [X]EP0433143 (TECNOMA [FR]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0566855 (SATRONIC AG [CH]); | [A]US5323807 (GAULD JAMES B [US], et al) [A] 10,11 * column 3, line 11 - column 3, line 29; figures 1,2 * |