EP0741253 - Press roll and machine with a press roll [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2001/09] |
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states De Pretto-Escher Wyss s.r.l. Via D. Manin 16/18 36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnyder, Eugen Rigistrasse 1 5622 Waltenschwil / CH | [2001/33] |
Former [1996/45] | 01 /
Schnyder, Eugen Rigistrasse 1 5622 Waltenmschwil / CH | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [2000/26] | Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [1996/45] | Heubeck, Bernhard c/o Sulzer Management AG KS Patente/0007 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 96810141.0 | 08.03.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | CH19950001300 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: CH 130095 | [1996/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0741253 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0741253 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741253 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16C13/00 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
F16C13/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, IT [1996/45] | Title | German: | Presswalze und Maschine mit Presswalze | [1996/45] | English: | Press roll and machine with a press roll | [1996/45] | French: | Cylindre de pression et machine équipée d'un tel cylindre | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Request for further processing for: | 10.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4510865 (MOLINATTO BRUNO [IT]) [X] 1,7,8,11-14,16 * column W *; | [XA]US3638292 (GAGHAN STEPHEN B) [X] 1,2,9,12,13,16 * column 2, line 8 - line 49 * * column 2, line 58 - line 59 * * column 2, line 62 - line 75; figures 1,3 * [A] 6; | [XA]US3119324 (JUSTUS EDGAR J) [X] 1,7,8,12,13 * column 2, line 40 - line 55 * * column 3, line 23 - line 40 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 8; figures 1,3 * [A] 11; | [XA]DE1240804 (RAMISCH & CO DR) [X] 1,12-15 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 15 * * column 3, line 26 - line 37; figures 1-3 * [A] 2,7,8; | [XA]DE2363509 (WANKE WILHELM) [X] 1,12,13,16 * page 6, line 25 - page 8, line 5; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,7; | [A]FR2310882 (ESCHER WYSS SA [CH]) [A] 1-6,16 * page 5, line 11 - line 15 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 33 * * page 7, line 21 - line 34; figures 1-4 * |