EP0737684 - (Benzo)triazole containing compounds, their preparation and their use as metal deactivators and corrosion inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2003/46] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states Ciba SC Holding AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Jean-Pierre, Dr. Chemin de la Motta 257 1791 Courtaman / CH | [1996/42] | Application number, filing date | 96810205.3 | 02.04.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | CH19950001070 | 11.04.1995 Original published format: CH 107095 | [1996/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737684 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737684 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D249/18, C07D249/08, C09K15/30, C23F11/14, C10M133/44, // C10N30:12, C10N30:14 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (KR);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D249/18 (EP,US);
C09K15/30 (EP,US);
C10M133/44 (EP,US);
C23F11/149 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US);
C10N2040/00 (EP,US);
C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2040/32 (EP,US);
C10N2040/34 (EP,US);
C10N2040/36 (EP,US);
C10N2040/38 (EP,US);
C10N2040/40 (EP,US);
C10N2040/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/42] | Title | German: | (Benz)Triazolreste enthaltende Verbindungen, deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung als Metalldesaktivatoren und Korrosionsschutzmittel | [1996/42] | English: | (Benzo)triazole containing compounds, their preparation and their use as metal deactivators and corrosion inhibitors | [1996/42] | French: | Composés contenant des groupes (benzo)triazole, leur préparation et leur utilisation comme désactivateurs de métaux et inhibiteurs de corrosion | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 15.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 17.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.02.2004 | [2004/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1521762 (GEIGY AG J R) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE2601719 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [Y] 1-18 * page 17; table 2 *; | [D]US4153565 (BRAID MILTON, et al); | [Y]EP0006710 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-18 * column W *; | [Y]WO8501964 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | EP0160042 [ ] (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [Y]EP0160620 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-18 * column W *; | [Y]EP0365476 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-18 * column W *; | [Y]EP0385951 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-18 * column W *; | [D]US5032300 (O'NEIL ROBERT M [GB]); | [D]US5076948 (O'NEIL ROBERT M [GB], et al); | [A] - BELOUSOV A.M. ET AL., "Reaction of vinyl ethers with tetrazole", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19801222), vol. 93, no. 25, Database accession no. 239321n, page 846, column 1, XP002008837 [A] 1-18 * abstract * | [ ] - ZH. ORG. KHIM. (ZORKAE), (1980), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 1313 - 1315 | [ ] - J. ORG. CHEM. USSR (JOCYA9), (1980), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 1135 - 1137 | [DA] - KATRITZKY A.R. ET AL., "The chemistry of N-substituted benzotriazoles. Part 2. Reactions of benzotriazole with aldehydes and aldehyde derivatives. 1-(.alpha.-Hydroxyalkyl)-, 1-(.alpha.-alkoxyalkyl)-, and 1-(.alpha.-acyloxyalkyl)benzotriazoles", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1 (JCPRB4), (198704), no. 4, pages 791 - 797, XP002008836 [DA] 1-18 * Verbindungen (12), (13) und (18) * |