EP0825723 - Method of suppressing a disturbance during the analysis of a bio-electric measurement signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.-Ing. P. Osypka GmbH Basler Strasse 109 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | [1998/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geistert, Wolfgang, Dr. In den Kapellmatten 22 79618 Rheinfelden-Herten / DE | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG KS Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG, KS Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [1998/09] | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG, KS Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 96810548.6 | 16.08.1996 | [1998/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825723 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/12, A61B5/0428, A61B5/04, G06F19/00 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
H04B1/123 (EP);
A61B5/308 (US);
A61B5/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1998/45] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abschwächung einer Störung bei der Auswertung eines bioelektrischen Messsignals | [1998/09] | English: | Method of suppressing a disturbance during the analysis of a bio-electric measurement signal | [1998/09] | French: | Procédé pour supprimer une perturbation pendant l'analyse d'un signal bio-électrique de mesure | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/29] | 25.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.10.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4211237 (NAGEL JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 1-4,6-11 * column W *; | [XAY] - D.B. FRANCIS, "DEVICE FOR REMOVAL OF SINUSOIDAL NOISE FROM SAMPLED SIGNAL", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (198012), vol. 23, no. 7b, pages 3405 - 3407, XP002023648 [X] 1-4,6,11 * the whole document * [A] 9 [Y] 5,7,8 | [YA] - C. LEVKOV ET AL., "Subtraction of 50 Hz interference from the electrocardiogram", MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING AND COMPUTING, STEVENAGE GB, (198407), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 371 - 373, XP002023649 [Y] 5,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 10 | [A] - B. WIDROW ET AL., "Adaptive Noise Cancelling: Principles & Applications", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, NEW YORK US, (197512), vol. 63, no. 12, pages 1692 - 1716, XP002023650 [A] 1 * page 1701, column R, line 21 - page 1704, column L, line 23; figures 10-17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PROC.1975.10036 | [A] - J.A. VAN ALSTÉ ET AL., "Removal of Base-Line Wander and Power-Line Interference from the ECG by an Efficient FIR Filter with a Reduced Number of Taps", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, NEW YORK US, (198512), vol. BME-32, no. 12, pages 1052 - 1060, XP002023651 [A] 1 * abstract * |