EP0759523 - A self-locking cable tie strap with a symmetrical structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMAS & BETTS CORPORATION (a New Jersey Corporation) 1555 Lynnfield Road Memphis Tennessee 38119 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states THOMAS & BETTS CORPORATION (a New Jersey Corporation) 1555 Lynnfield Road Memphis Tennessee 38119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teagno, Vladimiro Via Cimabue 1/A 10137 Torino / IT | 02 /
Wells, Peter M., Jr. 1805 River Park Drive Germantown, TN 38139 / US | 03 /
Khokhar, Wasim 1002 Spanish Trell Cordove, Tennessee 38018 / US | [1997/47] |
Former [1997/09] | 01 /
Teagno, Vladimiro Via Cimabue 1/A 10137 Torino / IT | ||
02 /
Wells, Peter M., Jr. 1805 River Park Drive Germantown, TN 38139 / US | Representative(s) | Tonon, Gilberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 38-39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Tonon, Gilberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 96830444.4 | 02.08.1996 | [1997/09] | Priority number, date | IT1995RM00572 | 22.08.1995 Original published format: IT RM950572 | IT1995RM00648 | 28.09.1995 Original published format: IT RM950648 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759523 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759523 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/233 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
F16L3/2334 (EP,US);
B65D63/1063 (EP);
B65D63/1072 (EP);
B65D63/1081 (EP);
F16L3/2332 (EP,US);
F16L3/2336 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1997/09] | Title | German: | Selbstverriegelnder Kabelbinder mit symmetrischem Aufbau | [1997/09] | English: | A self-locking cable tie strap with a symmetrical structure | [1997/09] | French: | Serre-câble autoverrouillant ayant une structure symétrique | [1997/09] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 17.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Request for further processing for: | 02.09.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.09.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.03.2000 | CH | 15.03.2000 | LI | 15.03.2000 | NL | 15.03.2000 | SE | 15.03.2000 | LU | 02.08.2000 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/09] | BE | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
NL | 15.03.2000 | ||
SE | 15.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
SE | 15.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | BE | 15.03.2000 | |
CH | 15.03.2000 | ||
LI | 15.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 15.03.2000 | |
LI | 15.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3102311 (MARTIN HAROLD B, et al) [A] 1* figures 1,5 *; | [A]FR2082115 (CAILLAU ETS) [A] 1,2,7,9 * page 1, line 33 - page 2, line 4 * * page 2, line 15 - line 38 * * page 3, line 8 - line 22 * * figures 1,5 *; | [A]FR2089514 (THOMAS & BETTS CORP) [A] 1-3,11,12 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 14 * * page 4, line 15 - line 32 * * page 6, line 4 - line 32 * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1,4,5,8,9 *; | [A]DE2139091 (SCHMITT W) [A] 1-3,5,8,11,12 * page 2, line 23 - line 34 * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 17 * * page 4, line 35 - line 40 * * page 5, line 8 - line 19 * * claims 1,3 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB1383912 (CRITCHLEY BROS LTD) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,11 * page 1, line 89 - page 2, line 48 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2302435 (FIMO SA [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 26 - line 38 * * page 3, line 9 - line 23 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO8906328 (PANDUIT CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,4,8,11 * abstract * * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 6 * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 20 * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 16 * * claims 1-3 * * figure 5 *; | [A]EP0469908 (THOMAS & BETTS CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,4,11 * column 1, line 18 - line 36 * * column 3, line 37 - line 51 * * claims 1,4,7 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0611038 (SOERENSEN SOEREN CHRISTIAN [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,8,11,13 * column A * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 38 * * column 3, line 3 - line 35 * * claim 8 * * figures 2,4 * |