EP0763352 - Sanitary canaliser to urinate, particularly for the female urination in public restrooms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bertolani, Sergio Via San Michele 9 00069 Morlupo Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states Bertolani, Sergio Via San Michele 9 00069 Morlupo, Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 96830466.7 | 11.09.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | IT1995RM00614 | 14.09.1995 Original published format: IT RM950614 | [1997/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763352 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/455 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
A61F5/4556 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/12] | Title | German: | Hygienischer Urinableiter, insbesondere für Damen in öffentlichen Bedürfnisaustalten | [1997/12] | English: | Sanitary canaliser to urinate, particularly for the female urination in public restrooms | [1997/12] | French: | Canalisateur sanitaire pour uriner, notamment pour femme dans les toilettes publiques | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/30] | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4023216 (LI LAURIE RHEA) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 29; figures 6-9 * [Y] 8; | [Y]US4305161 (DIAZ RUDY J) [Y] 8 * abstract *; | [X]EP0158602 (CONSAGRA PIETRO) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 30; figure - *; | [X]EP0226277 (APLEX CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9311691 (CICIO WILLIAM H [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 8; figure - *; | [A]EP0594253 (SANIPLAST S R L [IT]) |