EP0841702 - Lateral or vertical DMOSFET with high breakdown voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS s.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Depetro, Riccardo Via Rimita, 12 I-28037 Domodossola (Novara) / IT | 02 /
Palmieri, Michele Via Ciniselli, 12 I-20019 Settimo Milanese (Milano) / IT | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Maggioni, Claudio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | Maggioni, Claudio c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96830575.5 | 11.11.1996 | [1998/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0841702 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/00, H01L29/78, H01L29/10 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
H01L29/7802 (EP,US);
H01L29/0696 (EP,US);
H01L29/1095 (EP,US);
H01L29/7816 (EP,US);
H01L29/4238 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/04] |
Former [1998/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lateraler oder vertikaler DMOSFET mit hoher Durchbruchspannung | [1998/20] | English: | Lateral or vertical DMOSFET with high breakdown voltage | [1998/20] | French: | DMOSFET latéral ou vertical avec haute tension de claquage | [1998/20] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2635613 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0696054 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * column 5, line 7 - column 7, line 23; figure - *; | [X]EP0615293 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 31; figure 40 *; | [A]FR2640081 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5710975 ; | [A]US5182222 (MALHI SATWINDER [US], et al) [A] 4 * column A; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820507), vol. 006, no. 072, Database accession no. (E - 105), & JP57010975 A 19820120 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * |