EP0740171 - Optical fiber attenuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zheng, Wenxin Radjursstigen 6 170 72 Solna / SE | 02 /
Hultén, Ola Tunnbrödsvägen 59 161 71 Bromma / SE | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Holmberg-Schwindt, Tor Martin, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Holmberg, Martin Tor, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1996/44] | Rosenquist, Per Olof, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 96850082.7 | 26.04.1996 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | SE19950001590 | 28.04.1995 Original published format: SE 9501590 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740171 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740171 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/255, G02B6/26 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
G02B6/2551 (EP,US);
G02B6/266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/44] | Title | German: | Fiberoptisches Dämpfungsglied | [1996/44] | English: | Optical fiber attenuator | [1996/44] | French: | Atténuateur à fibre optique | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/24] | 27.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2128766 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [A] 1,7,13; | [A]US4557556 (DECKER JR GEORGE A [US]) [A] 1,7; | [A]WO9313437 (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [A] 13 |