EP0732451 - Work vehicle for carrying out railway work [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Plasser Bahnbaumaschinen-Industriegesellschaft m.b.H. Johannesgasse 3 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states Franz Plasser Bahnbaumaschinen- Industriegesellschaft m.b.H. Johannesgasse 3 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states Franz Plasser Bahnbaumaschinen- Industriegesellschaft m.b.H. Johannesgasse 3 A-1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Theurer, Josef Johannesgasse 3 1010 Wien / AT | [1996/38] | Application number, filing date | 96890032.4 | 04.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | AT19950000471 | 16.03.1995 Original published format: AT 47195 | [1996/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0732451 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732451 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E01B27/17 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
E01B27/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/38] | Title | German: | Arbeitsfahrzeug zur Durchführung von Gleisbauarbeiten | [1996/38] | English: | Work vehicle for carrying out railway work | [1996/38] | French: | Véhicule pour réaliser des travaux sur voie ferrée | [1996/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4203367 (STEWART JOHN K [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 4, line 4 - column 7, line 55; figures 1-10 *[A] 5; | [XAY]EP0397956 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ [AT]) [X] 1,6,7 * column 5, line 43 - column 10, line 36; figures 1-6 * [A] 3 [Y] 2,4; | [YDA]US5301548 (THEURER JOSEF [AT]) [YD] 2,4 * column 4, line 60 - column 8, line 33; figures 1-3 * [A] 1 |