EP0760245 - Tennis racket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Head Sport Aktiengesellschaft Wuhrkopfweg 1 6921 Kennelbach / AT | [2002/27] |
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states Head Sport Aktiengesellschaft Wuhrkopfweg 1 A-6921 Kennelbach / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umlauft, Helmut, Ing. Hölzelestrasse 41 6971 Hard / AT | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Haffner, Thomas M. Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte KG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Haffner, Thomas M., Dr. Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 96890135.5 | 21.08.1996 | [1997/10] | Priority number, date | AT19950000453 | 22.08.1995 Original published format: AT 45395 | [1997/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760245 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760245 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A63B49/02 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
A63B49/02 (EP,US);
A63B49/038 (US);
A63B49/10 (EP);
A63B60/002 (EP,US);
A63B60/0081 (EP,US);
A63B60/54 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0202 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0203 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0204 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0207 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0212 (EP,US);
A63B2209/023 (EP,US);
A63B49/03 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1997/10] | Title | German: | Tennisschläger | [1997/10] | English: | Tennis racket | [1997/10] | French: | Raquette de tennis | [1997/10] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5368295 (SEVERA WILLIAM D [US], et al) [DA] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]EP0317711 (WILSON SPORTING GOODS [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 46 - column 7, line 52; figures 1-10,13 *; | [DA]USRE31419E (FROLOW) [DA] 1,2 * column 20, line 26 - line 50; figures 22-26,40 *; | [A]DE4021881 (KUEBLER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]USRE33372E (FROLOW); | [A]GB2203953 (YAMAHA CORP) |