EP0750583 - DEVICE FOR SORTING FLAT OBJECTS CONVEYED IN STACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states GRAPHA-HOLDING AG Seestrasse 41, Postfach 170 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states GRAPHA-HOLDING AG Seestrasse 41 CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRITSCHE, Beat Burstwiesenstrasse 37 CH-8606 Greifensee / CH | 02 /
SCHMID, Peter Flurlingerweg 4 CH-8212 Neuhausen / CH | 03 /
OPPLIGER, Jean-Claude Bruennlistrasse 66 CH-8155 Niederhasli / CH | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96900027.2 | 05.01.1996 | [1997/01] | WO1996CH00004 | Priority number, date | CH19950000114 | 16.01.1995 Original published format: CH 11495 | [1997/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9622242 | Date: | 25.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750583 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750583 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/04 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
B65H3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/01] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR VEREINZELUNG VON STAPELWEISE ZUGEFÜHRTEN FLACHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [1997/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR SORTING FLAT OBJECTS CONVEYED IN STACKS | [1997/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION D'OBJETS PLATS TRANSPORTES EN PILES | [1997/01] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 29.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2000
WITHDRAWN Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Zentralabteilung Technik ZT PA 1 Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2000/12] | 28.02.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.09.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 02.03.2001 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60232337 ; | [A]FR1068162 (D APP DE PREC SOC D ET CONST) [A] 5-10* the whole document *; | [A]DE1170971 (PARNALL & SONS LTD) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1536710 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2209427 (HART JOHN RANDLE DE) [A] 1,14 * page 6, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 1; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860412), vol. 010, no. 096, Database accession no. (M - 469), & JP60232337 A 19851119 (FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |