EP0750687 - HIGH HARDNESS MARTENSITIC STAINLESS STEEL WITH GOOD PITTING CORROSION RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI METALS, LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states HITACHI METALS, LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEHARA, Toshihiro 1240-5, Hashimacho, Yasugi-shi Shimane 692 / JP | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96900420.9 | 10.01.1996 | [1997/01] | WO1996JP00017 | Priority number, date | JP19950003909 | 13.01.1995 Original published format: JP 390995 | [1997/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9621747 | Date: | 18.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750687 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750687 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0750687 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/20, C22C38/22 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/20 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1997/01] | Title | German: | MARTENSITISCHER. ROSTFREIER STAHL MIT GUTER BESTÄNDIGKEIT GEGEN LOCHFRASSKORROSION UND MIT HOHER HÄRTE | [1997/01] | English: | HIGH HARDNESS MARTENSITIC STAINLESS STEEL WITH GOOD PITTING CORROSION RESISTANCE | [1997/01] | French: | ACIER INOXYDABLE MARTENSITIQUE HAUTE DURETE, AYANT UNE BONNE RESISTANCE A LA CORROSSION PAR PIQURES | [1997/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2000
12.07.2000
ADMISSIBLE Edelstahl Witten Krefeld GmbH Auestr. 4 58452 Witten / DE Opponent's representative Simons, Johannes, et al, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2000
Edelstahl Witten Krefeld GmbH Auestr. 4 58452 Witten / DE Opponent's representative Simons, Johannes, et al, et al COHAUSZ & FLORACK Postfach 33 02 29A 40435 Düsseldorf / DE | 09.08.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.02.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05) | 29.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.06.2004 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.05.2005 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US4450006 (UYEHARA NORIOKI [JP], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,5,7-10 *whole document*; | [A]EP0472305 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 *Table 1 and claims*; | [A]JPH05163556 ; | [A]EP0178334 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 *Table 2 and claims*; | [A]JPH0456749 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931014), vol. 017, no. 567, Database accession no. (C - 1120), & JP05163556 A 19930629 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920608), vol. 016, no. 249, Database accession no. (C - 0948), & JP04056749 A 19920224 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | Examination | - BRIGGS J.Z.; PARKER T.D.: 'The Super 12% Cr Steels', Climax Molybdenum Company, 1270 Avenue of the Americas, New York, 10020, 1965, pages 32 - 36. | - MELFORD D.A.: 'The influence of residual and trace elements on hot shortness and high temperature embrittlement', Phil. Trans. R. Soc. Land. A 295, 89-103, 1980. |