EP0755923 - Ameliorant or remedy for symptoms caused by Ischemic diseases and Phenylpiperidine compounds useful therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/05] | AMELIORANT OR REMEDY FOR SYMPTOMS CAUSED BY ISCHEMIC DISEASES AND COMPOUNDS USEFUL THEREFOR | ||
[1997/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiichi Suntory Pharma Co., Ltd. 5-7-2, Kojimachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2003/21] |
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states SUNTORY LIMITED 1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANNOURA, Hirokazu 16-8, kitashinotani Chouhouji Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617 / JP | 02 /
UESUGI, Mayumi 418-29, Meyasu Ikaruga-cho Ikoma-gun Nara 636-01 / JP | 03 /
MATSUKI, Shinsuke 4-5-303, Nishichujyo-cho Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | 04 /
FUKUNAGA, Atsuko 201-6-304, Kozukue-cho Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222 / JP | 05 /
TATSUOKA, Toshio 2-18-27, Kamikoutouen Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662 / JP | 06 /
TAMURA, Shigeki 3-5-302, Shimochujyo-cho Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | 07 /
INOMATA, Norio 3-5-8, Sakurai Mino-shi Osaka 562 / JP | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/05] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96900738.4 | 23.01.1996 | [1997/05] | WO1996JP00119 | Priority number, date | JP19950008241 | 23.01.1995 Original published format: JP 824195 | JP19950008403 | 23.01.1995 Original published format: JP 840395 | JP19950008470 | 23.01.1995 Original published format: JP 847095 | [1997/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9622977 | Date: | 01.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755923 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755923 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/20, C07D211/32, C07D211/28, C07D211/70, C07D295/088, C07D295/096, C07D295/073, C07D295/033, C07D295/108, A61K31/445, A61K31/495, C07D405/06 | [1997/06] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1997/05] | C07D211/20, C07D211/32, C07D211/28, C07D211/70, C07D295/088, C07D295/096, C07D295/073, C07D295/033, C07D295/108, C07D405/06, A61K31/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/05] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG ODER HEILUNG VON DURCH ISCHÄMISCHEN KRANKHEITEN HERVORGERUFENEN SYMTOMEN UND DAFÜR VERWENDBARE PHENYLPIPERIDINVERBINGUNGEN | [1997/12] | English: | Ameliorant or remedy for symptoms caused by Ischemic diseases and Phenylpiperidine compounds useful therefor | [1997/12] | French: | AMELIORANT OU REMEDE CONTRE DES SYMPTOMES PROVOQUES PAR DES MALADIES ISCHEMIQUES ET COMPOSES PHENYLPIPERIDINIQUES UTILES A CET EFFET | [1997/12] |
Former [1997/05] | VERBESSERUNG ODER HEILUNG VON DURCH ISCHÄMISCHEN KRANKHEITEN HERVORGERUFENEN SYMTOMEN UND DAFÜR VERWENDBARE VERBINDUNGEN | ||
Former [1997/05] | AMELIORANT OR REMEDY FOR SYMPTOMS CAUSED BY ISCHEMIC DISEASES AND COMPOUNDS USEFUL THEREFOR | ||
Former [1997/05] | AMELIORANT OU REMEDE CONTRE DES SYMPTOMES PROVOQUES PAR DES MALADIES ISCHEMIQUES ET COMPOSES UTILES A CET EFFET | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.1996 | Translation filed | 19.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.1996 | Search fee paid | 19.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 12.03.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.05.2005 | BE | 04.05.2005 | NL | 04.05.2005 | DK | 04.08.2005 | GR | 04.08.2005 | SE | 04.08.2005 | PT | 17.10.2005 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2007/16] |
Former [2006/44] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
BE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
BE | 04.05.2005 | ||
NL | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
BE | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
GR | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 04.05.2005 | |
BE | 04.05.2005 | ||
DK | 04.08.2005 | ||
SE | 04.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 04.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0347305 (INST RECH CHIM BIOLOG [FR]) [X] 11,18,23,30,35,40,45 * example 28; claims 1-5 *; | ES2020127 [ ] (FERRER INT [ES]); | [Y]WO9311107 (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZET [HU]) [Y] 1-49 * claims 1-16 *; | [Y]WO9322302 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-49 * claims 1-18 *; | [PY]WO9503291 (RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZET [HU], et al) [PY] 1-49 * claims 1-12 *; | [PY]WO9511238 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [PY] 1-49 * claims 1-11 *; | [PY]WO9511240 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [PY] 1-49 * claims 1-11 *; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920316), vol. 116, no. 11, Database accession no. 106319q, page 782, XP002021181 [A] 11-17,46,47 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS5395963 (HOECHST AG); | [X]US4241071 (ANDERSON VERNON B [US], et al); | [Y]JPS6447776 (FERRER INTERNATL SA); | [Y]JPH02218651 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD); | [Y]JPH02225464 (FERROSAN AS); | [X]JPH03505456 | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICAL CHEMISTRY, 1979, Vol. 22, No. 11, LAURENCE L. MARTIN et al., pp. 1347-1354. |