EP0753552 - RECORDING FLUID FOR INK-JET PRINTING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Revocation of patent | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | 20.05.2005 | New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO INK MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states TOYO INK MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIDA, Seiji Toyo Ink Manuf. Co., Ltd, 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104 / JP | 02 /
FUJIGAMORI, Tsutomu Toyo Ink Manuf. Co., Ltd, 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104 04 / JP | 03 /
TOYODA, Ichiro Toyo Ink Manuf. Co., Ltd, 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104 / JP | 04 /
URAKI, Hisashi Toyo Ink Manuf. Co., Ltd, 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104 / JP | 05 /
SATAKE, Sunao Toyo Ink Manuf. Co., Ltd, 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104yo 104 / JP | 06 /
SAWADA, Seiji Toyo Ink Manuf. Co., Ltd, 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104yo 104 / JP | 07 /
IIDA, Yasuharu Toyo Ink Manuf. Co., Ltd, 3-13, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104yo 104 / JP | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96901122.0 | 26.01.1996 | [1997/03] | WO1996JP00147 | Priority number, date | JP19950011501 | 27.01.1995 Original published format: JP 1150195 | JP19950011502 | 27.01.1995 Original published format: JP 1150295 | JP19950011503 | 27.01.1995 Original published format: JP 1150395 | JP19950238161 | 18.09.1995 Original published format: JP 23816195 | [1997/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623032 | Date: | 01.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0753552 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0753552 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/30 (KR);
C09D11/326 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/03] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR DAS TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1997/03] | English: | RECORDING FLUID FOR INK-JET PRINTING AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [1997/03] | French: | FLUIDE D'IMPRESSION POUR IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1997/03] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1996 | Translation filed | 16.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 16.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.08.2004
ADMISSIBLE Clariant Service GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2004/41] | 16.09.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.02.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.02.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/27] | Request for further processing for: | 26.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.12.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2512108 (CHEMETRON CORP) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 10 - page 14, line 11; claims 1,3-5 *; | [A]US4597794 (OHTA TOKUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 11 - column 8, line 5 *; | [A]EP0783023 (LEXMARK INT INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 26 - line 39 * * page 9, line 28 - line 38; claim 1 * | International search | [A]JPH04309572 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [A]JPH05263028 ; | [A]JPH0649400 (BROTHER IND LTD); | [A]JPH06157954 (DU PONT) |