EP0906743 - WATERLESS CLOSET ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states He, Englong Dongli 10, Anwei Xiao Guan, Chaoyang District Beijing 100029 / CN | [2002/18] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states He, Englong Dongli 10, Anwai Yiao Guan, Chaoyang District Beijing 100029 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Schuster, Gregor Patentanwälte Schuster, Müller & Partner mbB Wiederholdstrasse 10 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Schuster, Gregor Patentanwälte Schuster & Partner Wiederholdstrasse 10 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96901216.0 | 02.02.1996 | [1999/14] | WO1996CN00009 | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9727795 | Date: | 07.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0906743 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0906743 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47K11/02 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
A47K11/026 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/14] | Title | German: | WASSERSPÜLUNGSFREIE TOILETTENEINRICHTUNG | [1999/14] | English: | WATERLESS CLOSET ASSEMBLY | [1999/14] | French: | ENSEMBLE FORMANT WC SANS CHASSE D'EAU | [1999/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.1998 | Translation filed | 21.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.1998 | Search fee paid | 21.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 07.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 20.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.10.1998 | M01   Fee paid on   07.11.1998 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CH525134 (PACTOSAN AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,5,9,12 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [A]US3648302 (WINTERS PAUL T) [A] 1-5,9,12 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US3619822 (CARMICHAEL THOMAS); | [Y]US2671906 (POTTS ROBERT W); | [A]US4025969 (DAHLEN GUNNAR JOHN); | [A]WO9410893 (INNOVATION INGENIERIE INTEGRAT [FR], et al); | [A]CN2201041Y (HAO ENXIANG [CN]); | [A]CN2196997Y (HE ENXIANG [CN]) |