EP0807010 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING LIQUID ALCOHOL-CONTAINING OIL-IN-WATER EMULSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.12.2002 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [1999/44] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÖRSTER, Thomas Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 15 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | 02 /
CLAAS, Marcus Schützenstrasse 70 b D-40723 Hilden / DE | 03 /
WEGENER, Ingo Am Falder 133 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
HECK, Stephan Aggerstrasse 9 D-50259 Pulheim / DE | [1997/47] | Application number, filing date | 96901316.8 | 22.01.1996 | [1997/47] | WO1996EP00238 | Priority number, date | DE1995102892 | 30.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19502892 | [1997/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623638 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807010 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/38, C10M173/00 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
C10M173/00 (EP);
C10M127/00 (EP);
C10M129/06 (EP);
C10M129/16 (EP);
C10M129/70 (EP);
C10M129/72 (EP);
C10M129/74 (EP);
C10M129/76 (EP);
C10M173/02 (EP);
C10M2201/02 (EP);
C10M2203/00 (EP);
C10M2203/02 (EP);
C10M2203/022 (EP);
C10M2203/024 (EP);
C10M2203/04 (EP);
C10M2203/06 (EP);
C10M2207/021 (EP);
C10M2207/04 (EP);
C10M2207/046 (EP);
C10M2207/281 (EP);
C10M2207/282 (EP);
C10M2207/283 (EP);
C10M2207/284 (EP);
C10M2207/285 (EP);
C10M2207/286 (EP);
C10M2207/287 (EP);
C10M2207/288 (EP);
C10M2207/289 (EP);
C10M2207/34 (EP);
C10N2040/00 (EP);
C10N2040/30 (EP);
C10N2040/32 (EP);
C10N2040/34 (EP);
C10N2040/36 (EP);
C10N2040/38 (EP);
C10N2040/40 (EP);
C10N2040/42 (EP);
C10N2040/44 (EP);
C10N2040/50 (EP);
C10N2050/01 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLÜSSIGE ALKOHOLE ENTHALTENDEN ÖL-IN-WASSER-EMULSIONEN | [1997/47] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING LIQUID ALCOHOL-CONTAINING OIL-IN-WATER EMULSIONS | [1997/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'EMULSIONS D'HUILE DANS L'EAU CONTENANT DES ALCOOLS LIQUIDES | [1997/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/05] | 09.09.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]EP0678363 (CHRYSO SA [FR]) [PX] 1,5,6,9 * column W *; | [X]WO8505066 (KOEGE KEMISK VAERK [DK]) [X] 1,5-9 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH05305608 ; | [A]JPH05293812 ; | [A]JPS5720309 ; | [A]SU1608051 ; | [A]JPS56162608 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940222), vol. 18, no. 108, Database accession no. (M - 1564), & JP05305608 A 19931119 (KAO CORP.) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 51, Database accession no. 93-408590 (51), & JPH05305608 A 19931119 (KAO CORP.) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940210), vol. 18, no. 83, Database accession no. (M - 1558), & JP05293812 A 19931109 (KAO CORP.) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 49, Database accession no. 93-392116 (49), & JPH05293812 A 19931109 (KAO CORP.) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 10, Database accession no. 82-18977E (10), XP002001926 & JPS5720309 A 19820202 (DAIICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 31, Database accession no. 91-228739 (31), XP002001927 & SU1608051 A 19901123 (RURAL CONSTR. RES.) [A] 2,9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 04, Database accession no. 82-06927E (04), XP002001928 & JPS56162608 A 19811214 (KINDAI KAGAKU K.K.) [A] 1,5,9 * abstract * |