EP0754699 - COMPLETELY DISSOLVED BONE TISSUE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SANGI 11-6, Tsukiji 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SANGI 11-6, Tsukiji 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Anjun Kabushiki Kaisha Sangi Sapporo Kenkyujo 4-11, Minami 10-jyo Nishi 6-chome Chuo-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 064 / JP | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | White, Martin David MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | White, Martin David MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96901526.2 | 02.02.1996 | [1997/04] | WO1996JP00219 | Priority number, date | JP19950039134 | 02.02.1995 Original published format: JP 3913495 | [1997/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9623805 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754699 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07G17/00, A23K1/16, A23K1/175, A23L1/30, A23L1/304, A61K7/00, A61K33/06, A61K35/28, A61K35/32, A61K35/56 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
A61K35/60 (EP,US);
A23K20/147 (EP,US);
A23K20/24 (EP,US);
A23K20/30 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A61K35/32 (EP,US);
A61K35/655 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61K8/981 (EP,US);
A61K8/987 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/04] | Title | German: | VOLLSTÄNDIG GELÖSTES KNOCHENGEWEBE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1997/04] | English: | COMPLETELY DISSOLVED BONE TISSUE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1997/04] | French: | TISSU OSSEUX COMPLETEMENT DISSOUS ET PROCEDE POUR LE PRODUIRE | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1996 | Translation filed | 03.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 03.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 29.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]RU2010830 ; | [X]WO9217167 (BIOTECH AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 5 * page 8, line 10 - line 16 * * page 10, line 11 - line 12 *; | [A]JPH06298621 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 03, Database accession no. 95-020589, XP002022039 & RU2010830 A 19940415 (EKOTEKHMASH RES PRODN ENTERPRISE) [X] 1,5,6,10-12 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 02, Database accession no. 95-011724, XP002022040 & JPH06298621 A 19941025 (SANGI KK) [A] 5 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0416165 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD); | [A]JPS59216554 (TANAKA YAKUHIN KK); | [A]JPS59175435 (RIZHSKIJ MED INST, et al) |