EP0813677 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING A CONTINUOUS STREAM OF BULK MATERIAL AND DETERMINING THE DELIVERY RATE OR BATCHING QUANTITY THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Labschies, Hartmut Johann-Valentin-Maystrasse 2 64665 Alsbach-Hähnlein / DE | [1997/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [2009/52] |
Former [1997/52] | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 14 55 53704 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96901695.5 | 02.02.1996 | [1997/52] | WO1996DE00163 | Priority number, date | DE1995104992 | 15.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19504992 | [1997/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9625648 | Date: | 22.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0813677 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0813677 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01G11/00 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
B65G65/4818 (EP,US);
G01F1/30 (EP,US);
G01F1/80 (EP,US);
G01G11/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/52] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES KONTINUIERLICHEN SCHÜTTGUTSTROMES SOWIE DIE ERMITTLUNG DESSEN FÖRDERSTÄRKE BZW. DOSIERMENGE | [1997/52] | English: | DEVICE FOR GENERATING A CONTINUOUS STREAM OF BULK MATERIAL AND DETERMINING THE DELIVERY RATE OR BATCHING QUANTITY THEREOF | [1997/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UN COURANT CONTINU DE MATERIAU EN VRAC, ET DETERMINATION DU DEBIT DE DECHARGE OU DE LA QUANTITE DE DOSAGE DE CE MATERIAU | [1997/52] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 08.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.04.1998 | 01.03.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.02.2002 | BE | 28.02.2002 | [2003/48] |
Former [2003/01] | GB | 02.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [AD]CH362542 (HELD HANS [DE]) [AD] 1* page 2, line 78 - line 88; figure 4 *; | [A]US3805904 (ZIMMERER R) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [AD]EP0292723 (SCHENCK AG CARL [DE]) [AD] 1 * column A * * column 1, line 21 - line 31 * * column 4, line 25 - line 36; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0615113 (PFISTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 30 - line 58; figure 2 * |