EP0801561 - COMPOSITION AND METHODS FOR TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF ACID-LABILE DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 11960 S.W. 144th Street Miami, FL 33186 / US | [1997/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Chensheng 14465 Southwest 139th Avenue Miami, FL 33186 / US | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [1997/43] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 96902047.8 | 11.01.1996 | [1997/43] | WO1996US00015 | Priority number, date | US19950369756 | 06.01.1995 Original published format: US 369756 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9620699 | Date: | 11.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0801561 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801561 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K47/10, A61K47/18 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
A61K9/7053 (EP);
A61K9/70 (KR);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR);
A61K47/18 (EP,KR);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/7061 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/43] | Extension states | LT | 01.08.1997 | LV | 01.08.1997 | SI | 01.08.1997 | Title | German: | MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR TRANSDERMALEN VERABREICHUNG SÄURELABILER ARZNEISTOFFE | [1997/43] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHODS FOR TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF ACID-LABILE DRUGS | [1997/43] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCEDES POUR L'ADMINISTRATION TRANSDERMIQUE DE MEDICAMENTS LABILES SOUS L'EFFET D'UN ACIDE | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 20.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0196769 (UNIV RUTGERS [US]) [X] 1-4,12 * page 12 - page 13; table 10 *; | [X]EP0275716 (UNIV NEW JERSEY [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,12 * page 17 - page 20; example 8; table 6 *; | [A]EP0379045 (NOVEN PHARMA [US]) [A] 8-10* page 17; example 14 *; | [X]EP0483105 (CYGNUS THERAPEUTIC SYSTEMS [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,12 * page 7; example 1 * * page 8; examples 10-15 *; | [X]WO9210154 (THERATECH INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,12 * page 27; example 5 *; | [X]WO9308795 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,12 * page 12 - page 14; examples 5-7 *; | [X]EP0573133 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7,12 * page 6; example 3 * * page 7; example 5 *; | [PXL]WO9518603 (NOVEN PHARMA [US], et al) [PXL] 1-12 * THE PRIORITY CLAIM OF THE PRESENT APPLICATION MIGHT NOT BE JUSTIFIED.; page 54 - page 56; examples 31-33 * |