EP0811262 - DIODE LASER COMPONENT WITH COOLING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/50] | DIODE LASER COMPONENT WITH COOLING ELEMENT AND DIODE LASER MODULE | ||
[2000/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DILAS DIODENLASER GMBH Galileo-Galilei-Strasse 10 55129 Mainz / DE | For all designated states Ullmann, Christoph, Dr. Pfarrer Hambüchenweg 11 53639 Königswinter / DE | For all designated states Krause, Volker Kupferbergstrasse 4 67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE | [1999/01] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states DILAS DIODENLASER GMBH Galileo-Galilei-Strasse 10 55129 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULLMANN, Christoph Pfarrer Hambüchen-Weg 12 D-53639 Königswinter / DE | 02 /
KRAUSE, Volker Kupferbergstrasse 4 D-67292 Kirchheimbolanden / DE | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Graf, Helmut, et al Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Graf, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96902874.5 | 21.02.1996 | [1997/50] | WO1996DE00265 | Priority number, date | DE1995106093 | 22.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19506093 | [1997/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626560 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811262 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811262 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/024, H01L33/00, H01L23/473 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
H01L33/648 (EP,US);
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
H01S5/024 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01S3/005 (EP,US);
H01S5/02423 (EP,US);
H01S5/4025 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/50] | H01S3/043, H01L33/00, H01L23/473 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/50] | Title | German: | DIODENLASERBAUELEMENT MIT KÜHLELEMENT | [2000/31] | English: | DIODE LASER COMPONENT WITH COOLING ELEMENT | [2000/31] | French: | COMPOSANT A DIODE LASER AVEC ELEMENT DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2000/31] |
Former [1997/50] | DIODENLASERBAUELEMENT MIT KÜHLELEMENT SOWIE DIODENLASERMODUL | ||
Former [1997/50] | DIODE LASER COMPONENT WITH COOLING ELEMENT AND DIODE LASER MODULE | ||
Former [1997/50] | COMPOSANT A DIODE LASER AVEC ELEMENT DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET MODULE A DIODE LASER | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 18.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 20.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/16] | GB | 16.05.2001 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0508717 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,3,9-11,14 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 56; figure 4 * * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 12 * [A] 2,7,8,17,22; | [A]DE4315580 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1,2,9,17-22 * column 5, line 4 - line 65; figures 1-9 *; | [DA]US5105430 (MUNDINGER DAVID C [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column 4 *; | [A]JPS6016431 ; | [DA]US4516632 (SWIFT GREGORY W [US], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850606), vol. 009, no. 131, Database accession no. (E - 319), & JP60016431 A 19850128 (HITACHI DENSEN KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |