EP0775061 - DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING FUEL FROM A TANK TO AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEPPNER, Stephan Gartenstrasse 54 D-75015 Bretten / DE | 02 /
SEITZ, Ansgar Rupert-Mayer-Strasse 10 D-73765 Neuhausen / DE | [1997/22] | Application number, filing date | 96902894.3 | 23.02.1996 | [1997/22] | WO1996DE00303 | Priority number, date | DE1995121509 | 13.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19521509 | [1997/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9641727 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/56] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775061 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775061 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/077 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
B60K15/077 (EP,KR,US);
F02M37/025 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03105 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1997/22] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM FÖRDERN VON KRAFTSTOFF AUS EINEM VORRATSTANK ZU EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [1997/22] | English: | DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING FUEL FROM A TANK TO AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1997/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR ACHEMINER DU CARBURANT D'UN RESERVOIR JUSQU'A UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1997/22] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 13.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE3510890 (PIERBURG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1,5,6,9 * page 7, line 23 - line 33; figure 2; claims 1,2,11 *; | [A]FR2544670 (THIBONNET BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 15 - page 27; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2271327 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [A] * figures FIG,4,5 * |