EP0811012 - METHOD OF PRODUCING L-ASPARTYL-D-ALANINE-N-(THIETHANE-3-YL)-AMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 45764 Marl / DE | ||
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAUZ, Karlheinz Zur Marienruhe 13 D-63579 Freigericht / DE | 02 /
KNAUP, Günter Friedhofstrasse 8 D-63486 Bruchköbel / DE | 03 /
RETZOW, Stefan Hohe-Mark-Strasse 21 D-63755 Alzenau / DE | 04 /
SCHWARM, Michael Hauckwaldstrasse 1 D-63755 Alzenau / DE | 05 /
WECKBECKER, Christoph Grünaustrasse 5 D-63457 Hanau / DE | [1997/50] | Application number, filing date | 96902957.8 | 31.01.1996 | [1997/50] | WO1996EP00393 | Priority number, date | DE1995105933 | 21.02.1995 Original published format: DE 19505933 | [1997/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626213 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811012 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0811012 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06 | [1997/50] | CPC: |
C07K5/06113 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON L-ASPARTYL-D-ALANIN-N-(THIETAN-3-YL)-AMIDEN | [1997/50] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING L-ASPARTYL-D-ALANINE-N-(THIETHANE-3-YL)-AMIDES | [1997/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE L-ASPARTYL-D-ALANINE-N-(THIETANE-3-YL)-AMIDES | [1997/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 10.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPH07435352 [ ] (SUMITOMO); | [AD]EP0034876 (PFIZER [US]) [AD] 1-27* column W *; | [AD]AT394854B (BIOCHEMIE GMBH [AT]) [AD] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A] - T NAGASE & F MASUKO, "Alpha-L-Asparaginyl-L-amino acid esters", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19741111), vol. 81, no. 19, Database accession no. 121026u, page 578, XP002003940 [A] 1-27 * abstract * | [A] - K BURGER & M RUDOLPH, "Regiospecific reaction with omega-carboxy alpha-amino acids. A simple synthesis of aspartame", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910121), vol. 114, no. 3, Database accession no. 24570j, page 765, XP002003941 [A] 1-27 * abstract * | [D] - CHEM. ZEITUNG, (1990), vol. 114, no. 7-8, pages 249 - 251 |