EP0812519 - A BASE STATION OF A RADIO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POSTI, Harri Torikatu 33 D 8 FIN-90100 Oulu / FI | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Holmström, Stefan Mikael, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Holmström, Stefan Mikael, et al Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 96903031.1 | 26.02.1996 | [1997/51] | WO1996FI00112 | Priority number, date | FI19950000916 | 28.02.1995 Original published format: FI 950916 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9627269 | Date: | 06.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0812519 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0812519 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30, H04B7/26 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
H04W88/085 (EP,US);
H04B7/2609 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/51] | Title | German: | BASISSTATION FÜR FUNKSYSTEM | [1997/51] | English: | A BASE STATION OF A RADIO SYSTEM | [1997/51] | French: | STATION DE BASE POUR SYSTEME RADIO | [1997/51] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 29.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 27.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 26.02.2005 | IE | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | DK | 26.04.2005 | GR | 26.04.2005 | PT | 26.06.2005 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/16] | LU | 26.02.2005 | |
IE | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | IE | 28.02.2005 | |
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | MC | 28.02.2005 | |
DK | 26.04.2005 | ||
GR | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | DK | 26.04.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0439926 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [Y]WO9320625 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]EP0600681 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) |