EP0809737 - ELECTROHYDRAULIC PROPORTIONAL CONTROL VALVE ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ultronics Limited Ultronics House, Athelney Way, Battledown Industrial Estate Cheltenham GL52 6RT / GB | [2007/38] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states Ultronics Limited Ultronics House, Athelney Way, Battledown Industrial Estate Cheltenham GL52 6RT / GB | ||
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states Ultronics Limited Anson Business Park, Cheltenham Road East Staverton, Gloucester GL2 9QN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNER, Stephen, Brian The Grove Farfield, Cam Dursley Gloucestershire GL11 5HE / GB | 02 /
LAKIN, David, Franz 45 Albemarle Road Churchdown Gloucester GL3 2HE / GB | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 20 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Marks & Clerk 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham, GL50 1RQ / GB | ||
Former [1997/49] | Higgins, Michael Roger A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96903123.6 | 22.02.1996 | [1997/49] | WO1996GB00393 | Priority number, date | GB19950003854 | 25.02.1995 Original published format: GB 9503854 | [1997/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9627051 | Date: | 06.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0809737 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0809737 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0809737 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20, E02F9/22, F15B11/05 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
F15B11/167 (EP);
E02F9/20 (KR);
E02F9/2025 (EP);
E02F9/22 (KR);
E02F9/2228 (EP);
E02F9/2285 (EP);
F15B11/163 (EP);
F15B21/087 (EP);
F15B2211/3057 (EP);
F15B2211/327 (EP);
F15B2211/50536 (EP);
F15B2211/5157 (EP);
F15B2211/575 (EP);
F15B2211/6309 (EP);
F15B2211/6313 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, IT, NL, SE [1999/05] |
Former [1997/49] | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHE PROPORTIONALE STEUERVENTILVORRICHTUNG | [1997/49] | English: | ELECTROHYDRAULIC PROPORTIONAL CONTROL VALVE ASSEMBLIES | [1997/49] | French: | ENSEMBLES DE VANNES ELECTROHYDRAULIQUES A REGULATION PAR ACTION PROPORTIONNELLE | [1997/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2000
28.03.2000
ADMISSIBLE Danfoss A/S 6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02
15.03.2000
28.03.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bosch Rexroth AG Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2000
28.03.2000
ADMISSIBLE Danfoss A/S DK-6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02
15.03.2000
28.03.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bosch Rexroth AG Zum Eisengiesser 1 97816 Lohr / DE | |||
Former [2000/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.2000
Danfoss A/S DK-6430 Nordborg / DK Opponent's representative Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02
15.03.2000
Mannesmann Rexroth GmbH Patentabteilung Jahnstrasse 3 - 5 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | 09.05.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.01.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.07.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.03.2004 | Appeal received No. T0267/04 | 14.05.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.01.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 21.02.2004 | Appeal received | 25.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0462589 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [X] 1,6,13,14 * column W *; | [DA]WO9301417 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [DA] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]US5305681 (DEVIER LONNIE J [US], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * column W * | Examination | US33846 | EP0038128 | DE3347000 | US5138838 |