EP0811838 - MICROBIAL ELECTRODE AND MICROBIAL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AKEBONO BRAKE INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 19-5, Nihonbashi Koami-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | For all designated states Akebono Research and Development Centre Ltd. 5-4-71, Higashi Hanyu-shi Saitama-ken 348-0052 / JP | For all designated states Karube, Isao 1-3-16, Higashiarima Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 216-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states AKEBONO BRAKE INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 19-5, Nihonbashi Koami-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | ||
For all designated states AKEBONO RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CENTRE LTD. 5-4-71, Higashi Hanyu-shi Saitama-ken 348 / JP | |||
For all designated states Karube, Isao 1-3-16, Higashiarima Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 216 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARUBE, Isao 1-3-16, Higashiarima Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 216 / JP | 02 /
YANO, Kiyoko Rivre-Komaba 206 1-36-1, Komaba, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Nobuyuki Berutsuri-kowa 202 4-56-8, Higashiomiya Omiya-shi, Saitama 330 / JP | 04 /
MORITA, Takashi 2-2-5, Sendagi, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113 / JP | [1997/50] | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96903204.4 | 21.02.1996 | [1997/50] | WO1996JP00393 | Priority number, date | JP19950033435 | 22.02.1995 Original published format: JP 3343595 | [1997/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626433 | Date: | 29.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0811838 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, G01N27/416, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/00 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
C12Q1/001 (EP);
C12Q1/004 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/50] | G01N27/327, G01N27/416, C12Q1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/50] | Title | German: | MIKROBIELLE ELEKTODE UND MIKROBIELLER SENSOR | [1997/50] | English: | MICROBIAL ELECTRODE AND MICROBIAL SENSOR | [1997/50] | French: | ELECTRODE MICROBIENNE ET SONDE MICROBIENNE | [1997/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.1997 | Translation filed | 04.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1997 | Search fee paid | 04.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 28.02.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0593096 (MEDISENSE INC) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 48 - page 5, line 4 * * examples 1,2,4 *; | [X] - ISAO KARUBE, "MICROBIAL SENSOR", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (19900801), vol. 15, no. 3, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 255 - 265, XP000136213 [X] 1-3,5-10 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1656(90)90031-6 | [A] - KARUBE ISAO, "Microbial Biosensors for Process and Environmental Control", IEEE ENIGNEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (199407), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 364 - 374, XP002132628 [A] 1-10 * page 370, paragraph 3 - page 371, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/51.294008 | International search | [Y]JPS57128839 ; | [Y]JPH0442049 ; | [Y]JPH02129541 ; | [Y]JPH01212345 ; | [Y]JPS58149746 ; | [P]JPH07167824 |